+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Law 278
- Signed by the Governor
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Representative Judy removed as advisor
- Representative Judy added as conferee
- Representative Moseley removed as conferee
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 610: yeas 40, nays 9
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 639: yeas 69, nays 28
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Walker added as conferee
- Senator Ford J.D. removed as conferee
- Senator Walker removed as advisor
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Sullivan, Judy and Boy
- House conferees appointed: Wesco and Moseley
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Walker and Breaux
- Senate conferees appointed: Houchin and Ford J.D.
- Senate dissented from House amendments
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to dissent filed
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 523: yeas 62, nays 24
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment #17 (Pierce) failed; Roll Call 494: yeas 28, nays 65
- Amendment #1 (Boy) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #8 (Moseley) failed; Roll Call 493: yeas 27, nays 66
- Amendment #9 (Moseley) failed; Roll Call 492: yeas 30, nays 61
- Amendment #14 (Baird) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- House sponsor: Representative Wesco
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 165: yeas 39, nays 0
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment #3 (Ford J.D.) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed; voice vote
- Amendment #1 (Breaux) failed; Division of the Senate: yeas 9, nays 38
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Bohacek added as coauthor
- Senator Walker added as second author
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Elections
- Authored by Senator Houchin
+ − Amendments (17)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor