+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Law 57
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Representative Moseley added as cosponsor
- Returned to the Senate without amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 334: yeas 93, nays 1
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- House sponsor: Rep. Ober
- Referred to the House
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 120: yeas 42 and nays 7
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment 1 (M. Young), prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Buck added as second author
- Senator Taylor added as third author
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Economic Development & Technology
- Authored by Senator M. Young
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment 0558-1
Passed