+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees appointed: Messmer and Lanane
- Senate advisors appointed: Mishler, Melton, Ford Jon and Leising
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Lehman, Smaltz, Bartels, Baird, DeLaney, Harris, Hatfield, Jackson, Pfaff, Porter, Pryor, Candelaria Reardon and Moed
- House conferees appointed: Huston and Austin
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate dissented from House amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 532: yeas 78, nays 15
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment #18 (Harris) failed; voice vote
- Amendment #1 (Huston) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #23 (Bauer) prevailed; Roll Call 503: yeas 61, nays 28
- Amendment #5 (Davisson) prevailed; Roll Call 504: yeas 55, nays 34
- Amendment #16 (Harris) failed; Roll Call 505: yeas 30, nays 60
- Amendment #13 (Mayfield) motion withdrawn
- Amendment #25 (Pryor) ruled out of order
- Amendment #30 (Lehman) prevailed; Division of the House: yeas 57, nays 30
- Amendment #24 (Harris) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #4 (Eberhart) motion withdrawn
- Amendment #3 (Sullivan) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Cosponsors: Representatives Lehman, Austin and Porter
- House sponsor: Representative Huston
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 246: yeas 38, nays 11
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #3 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #1 (Randolph Lonnie M) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #2 (Bohacek) prevailed; voice vote
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Breaux added as coauthor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senators Merritt and Lanane added as coauthors
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Melton added as coauthor
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
- Authored by Senators Messmer and Ford Jon