+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Representative Austin added as cosponsor
- Representative Mahan added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed;
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment #3 (Yoder) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Holdman added as third author
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Miller, Pat added as second author
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b) reassigned to committee on
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Broden added as coauthor
- Senator Arnold added as coauthor
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
- Authored by Senator Yoder