+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Law 237
- Signed by the Governor
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate;
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House;
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate dissented from House amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
- Concurrrence withdrawn
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
- Dissent withdrawn
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- House Advisors appointed: Lehman, Cox, Lawson L and Pierce
- House Conferees appointed: McNamara and Hale
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate dissented from House amendments
- Senate Conferees appointed: Head and Tallian
- Senate Advisors appointed: Houchin, Taylor and Brown L
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to dissent filed
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading: passed;
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Representative Lawson added as cosponsor
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Representatives Cox and Hale added as cosponsors
- Representative McNamara added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed;
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Tallian added as coauthor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
- Authored by Senators Head and Houchin
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor