+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Law 260
On May 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 607: yeas 97, nays 0
- Rules suspended
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 528: yeas 50, nays 0
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Kubacki, Ziemke and Porter
- House conferees appointed: Frizzell and Riecken
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate advisor appointed: Pat Miller and Taylor
- Senate conferee appointed: Kenley and Breaux
- Senate dissented from House amendments
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 465: yeas 94, nays 2
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment 2 (Porter), withdrawn
- Amendment 1 (Ziemke), prevailed; Division of the House: yeas 58, nays 34
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Representative Summers added as cosponsor
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Cosponsor: Rep. Porter
- House sponsor: Rep. Frizzell
- Referred to the House
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 48: yeas 47 and nays 0
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Breaux added as coauthor
- Senator Pat Miller added as second author
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
- Authored by Senator Kenley