+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Law 34
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate without amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 305: yeas 97, nays 0
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Representatives Hale and Bartlett added as cosponsors
- Ruling of the Chair appealed. Ruling sustained; Roll Call 268: yeas 64, nays 27
- Amendment 1 (Moseley), ruled out of order
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Cosponsor: Rep. Niemeyer
- House sponsor: Rep. Messmer
- Referred to the House
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 197: yeas 47 and nays 3
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Leising added as second author
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Committee report: amend do pass, reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
- Authored by Senator Charbonneau
+ − Amendment
House Amendment 0529-1
Filed