+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Select Committee on Government Reduction
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Holdman added as second author
- Senator Steele added as coauthor
- Senator Banks added as coauthor
- House sponsor: Rep. Mahan
- Referred to the House
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 161: yeas 36 and nays 13
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment 2 (Alting), ruled out of order
- Amendment 3 (Becker), prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment 2 (Alting), rejected; Roll Call 133: yeas 23, nays 27
- Amendment 1 (Head), prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Mrvan added as coauthor
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Economic Development & Technology
- Authored by Senator Head