+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Law 238
- Signed by the Governor
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Alting added as coauthor
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 544: yeas 98, nays 0
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 526: yeas 50, nays 0
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Representative Heine added as advisor
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Karickhoff, Huston, Brown C, Porter and Pryor
- House conferees appointed: Siegrist and GiaQuinta
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Eckerty, Stoops, Ford and Buck
- Senate conferees appointed: Hershman and Breaux
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate dissented from House amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
- Representative Pressel added as cosponsor
- Rule 105.1 suspended
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 386: yeas 97, nays 0
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment #2 (Miller D) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #1 (Brown T) prevailed; voice vote
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Representative GiaQuinta added as cosponsor
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Ford added as coauthor
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 169: yeas 46, nays 2
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 35 (c); technical correction committee report adopted
- Senator Eckerty added as second author
- House sponsor: Representative Siegrist
- Cosponsors: Representatives Brown, T. and Carbaugh
- Senator Buck added as third author
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
- Authored by Senator Hershman