+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Brown L added as coauthor
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Senator Koch added as coauthor
- Cosponsors: Representatives Beumer and Stemler
- House sponsor: Representative Ober
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 43: yeas 49, nays 0
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
- Senators Bassler, Stoops, Niezgodski added as coauthors
- Senator Eckerty added as second author
- Senator Tallian added as third author
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Glick added as coauthor
- Senator Merritt added as coauthor
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
- Authored by Senator Charbonneau
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor