+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Law 234
- Signed by the Governor
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate;
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House;
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- House Advisors appointed: Truitt, Huston and Smith V
- House Conferees appointed: Clere and Klinker
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to dissent filed
- Concurrrence withdrawn
- Senate Advisors appointed: Perfect, Stoops and Raatz
- Senate dissented from House amendments
- Senate Conferees appointed: Charbonneau and Rogers
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading: passed;
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #2 (Truitt) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #7 (Porter) failed; voice vote
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Representative Macer added as cosponsor
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 105.1 suspended
- Representative Klinker added as cosponsor
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed;
- Representative Clere added as sponsor
- Representative Truitt added as cosponsor
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Rogers added as third author
- Senator Kenley added as second author
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
- Authored by Senator Charbonneau
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor