+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 82
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Concur in House Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 367: yeas 26 and nays 12
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 312: yeas 69 and nays 23
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading: engrossed.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Lawson added as cosponsor.
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Bacon added as cosponsor.
- Representative C. Brown added as cosponsor.
- Representative Lawson removed as second sponsor.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading: Referred to Public Health
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Mrvan added as coauthor.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Representative Lawson added cosponsor.
- Representative Zent added as sponsor.
- Referred to the House
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 24: yeas 30 and nays 17
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Stoops added as coauthor.
- Senator Landske added as third author.
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #1 (Miller, Pat), prevailed.
On January 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Charbonneau added as second author
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted.
On January 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to Health and Provider Services
- Authored by Senator Miller Patricia
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor