+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (58)
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 152
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 416: yeas 67, nays 30
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 415: yeas 39, nays 9
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Niezgodski added as conferee
- Senator Tallian removed as conferee
- Senator Niezgodski removed as advisor
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Sullivan, Heine, Dvorak and Pryor
- House conferees appointed: Huston and Austin
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to dissent filed
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Bassler, Niezgodski, Perfect and Ruckelshaus
- Senate dissented from House amendments
- Senate conferees appointed: Eckerty and Tallian
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 312: yeas 96, nays 0
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Heine added as cosponsor
- Amendment #5 (Dvorak) prevailed; Roll Call 299: yeas 89, nays 0
- Amendment #6 (Austin) prevailed; Roll Call 298: yeas 90, nays 0
- Amendment #3 (Sullivan) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #4 (Huston) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Austin added as cosponsor
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Representative Cook added as cosponsor
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Melton added as coauthor
- Senator Glick added as coauthor
- Senator Delph added as coauthor
- House sponsor: Representative Huston
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 158: yeas 45, nays 3
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 35 (c); technical correction committee report adopted
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment #2 (Tallian) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #1 (Mishler) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #5 (Taylor G) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #3 (Niezgodski) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #4 (Niezgodski) prevailed; voice vote
- Senator Bohacek added as coauthor
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Senator Ruckelshaus added as coauthor
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Spartz added as coauthor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor
- Senator Alting added as coauthor
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators Niemeyer, Grooms, Ford, Sandlin, Raatz, Crider, Brown L, Bassler, Messmer, Zakas, Bray, Walker, Buck, Doriot, Kruse, Charbonneau added as coauthors
- Senator Perfect added as third author
- Senator Head added as second author
- Senator Eckerty added as author
- Senator Long removed as author
- Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
- Authored by Senator Long
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor