+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Law 119
- Signed by the Governor
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate without amendments
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Representative Dvorak added as cosponsor
- Third reading: passed;
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Representative Smaltz added as cosponsor
- Senator Young, M. added as third author
- Representative Cox added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed;
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Delph added as second author
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
- Authored by Senator Glick