+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Law 129
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 461: yeas 49, nays 0
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur in House amendments filed
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 361: yeas 95, nays 0
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Yoder added as second author
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 35 (c) technical corrections.
- Cosponsors: Reps. Smaltz, Zent and GiaQuinta
- House sponsor: Rep. Behning
- Referred to the House
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 173: yeas 46 and nays 2
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment 1 (Kruse), prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Broden added as coauthor
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Banks added as coauthor
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
- Authored by Senator Kruse
+ − Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 0464-1
Passed
Senate Amendment 0464-C
Passed