+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Bohacek added as coauthor
- Senator Brown L added as second author
- Cosponsor: Representative Aylesworth
- House sponsor: Representative Slager
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 82: yeas 50, nays 0
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
- Authored by Senator Niemeyer
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor