+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- House sponsor: Representative McNamara
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 207: yeas 26, nays 23
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Messmer removed as coauthor
- Amendment #3 (Mrvan) prevailed; voice vote
- Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed back on second reading
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #1 (Mrvan) prevailed; voice vote
- Senator Stoops added as coauthor
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Senator Grooms added as second author
- Senator Grooms removed as coauthor
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senators Grooms and Messmer added as coauthors
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
- Authored by Senator Mrvan