+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Law 105
- Signed by the Governor
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 281: yeas 48, nays 0
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 258: yeas 95, nays 0
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Representatives Heaton, Olthoff, Taylor J added as cosponsors
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Bohacek added as coauthor
- Senator Houchin added as coauthor
- Senator Grooms added as third author
- Senator Young M added as second author
- House sponsor: Representative DeVon
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 149: yeas 48, nays 0
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment #3 (Zay) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #1 (Zay) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
- Authored by Senator Zay
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor