+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Representatives Aylesworth and Macer added as cosponsor
- Representative Slager added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed;
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senators Mishler and Eckerty added as coauthor
- Amendment #3 (Niemeyer) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Young, M. added as third author
- Senator Ford added as second author
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
- Authored by Senator Niemeyer