+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Law 112
- Signed by the Governor
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 461: yeas 96 and nays 0
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 396: yeas 45 and nays 0
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Representative McMillin added as conferee
- Representative Moseley added as conferee
- Representative Rhoads added as advisor
- Representative Wolkins added as advisor
- Representative Forestal added as advisor
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Mrvan added as advisor
- Senator Kruse added as advisor
- Senator Taylor added as conferee
- Senator Head added as conferee
- Senate dissented from House amendments
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 380: yeas 96 and nays 0
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- SB 421 Amendment #1 (Lehe), prevailed.
- SB 421 Amendment #2 (Thompson), prevailed.
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Rhoads added as cosponsor.
- Representative McMillin added as sponsor.
- Representative Rhoads removed as sponsor.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading: Referred to Employment, Labor and Pensions
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Representative Rhoads added as sponsor.
- Referred to the House
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 132: yeas 48 and nays 0
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- SB 421 Amendment #5 (Miller, Pat), prevailed.
- Senator Kruse added as second author.
- SB 421 Amendment #4 (Merritt), prevailed.
- Reread second time; amended, ordered engrossed
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to second reading
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- SB 421 Amendment #1 (Head), prevailed.
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass amend, adopted.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to Commerce, Economic Development & Technology
- Authored by Senator Head.
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor