+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Law 172
- Signed by the Governor
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 404: yeas 85, nays 7
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 405: yeas 39, nays 8
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to dissent filed
- Senator Bohacek added as coauthor
- Concurrence withdrawn
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Clere, Mahan and Shackleford
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate dissented from House amendments
- Senate conferees appointed: Doriot and Lanane
- Senate advisors appointed: Koch, Randolph Lonnie M and Buck
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Morris and Bartlett
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Koch removed as second author
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 319: yeas 88, nays 8
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Cherry added as cosponsor
- Rule 105.1 suspended
- Amendment #1 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Clere added as cosponsor
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Miller added as cosponsor
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Ober removed as cosponsor
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Cosponsors: Representatives Ober and Ellington
- House sponsor: Representative Morris
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 195: yeas 35, nays 12
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Koch added as second author
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
- Authored by Senator Doriot