+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Mrvan added as coauthor
- Senator Crider added as second author
- Cosponsors: Representatives Pressel and Wolkins
- House sponsor: Representative Miller D
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 90: yeas 49, nays 0
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
- Authored by Senator Doriot