+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Representative Zent added as cosponsor
- Senator Arnold added as third author
- Representative Ubelhor added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed;
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Ford added as second author
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
- Authored by Senator Bassler
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor