+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Law 30
- Signed by the Governor
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate without amendments
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Representatives Lehman, Shackleford, Summers added as cosponsors
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 244: yeas 92, nays 1
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Representatives Shackleford and Summers removed as cosponsors
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Cosponsors: Representatives Shackleford and Summers
- House sponsor: Representative Vermilion
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 188: yeas 49, nays 0
- Senators Becker, Brown L, Busch, Crider, Donato, Leising, Melton, Yoder added as coauthors
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Charbonneau added as second author
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
- Authored by Senator Taylor G
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 1, 2022: Roll Call 188
- Yeas: 49
February 1, 2022: Roll Call 244
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor