+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment #4 (Bacon) failed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #3 (Mayfield) prevailed; voice vote
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Representative Austin added as cosponsor
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Ford J.D. removed as third author
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 111: yeas 43, nays 5
- House sponsor: Representative Bacon
- Cosponsor: Representative Kirchhofer
- Senator Breaux added as coauthor
- Senator Melton added as coauthor
- Senator Leising added as coauthor
- Senator Raatz added as coauthor
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Rogers added as coauthor
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Stoops added as coauthor
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Becker added as coauthor
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Ford J.D. added as third author
- Senator Crider added as second author
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
- Authored by Senator Charbonneau
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor