+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Law 227
- Signed by the Governor
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 637: yeas 98, nays 0
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 597: yeas 48, nays 1
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees appointed: Houchin and Breaux
- Senate dissented from House amendments
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Stutzman, Lehman, Austin and Bauer
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Bassler, Ford J.D. and Zay
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Carbaugh and Shackleford
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to dissent filed
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 522: yeas 83, nays 0
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment #4 (Carbaugh) prevailed; Roll Call 500: yeas 66, nays 25
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #2 (DeLaney) ruled out of order
- Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 501: yeas 28, nays 61
- Amendment #5 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Representative Shackleford added as cosponsor
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- House sponsor: Representative Carbaugh
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 234: yeas 41, nays 8
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Senator Bassler added as second author
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senators Walker, Ruckelshaus, Sandlin, Bohacek, Zay, Ford J.D. added as coauthors
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
- Authored by Senator Houchin