+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Cosponsor: Representative Ledbetter C
- House sponsor: Representative Vermilion
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 187: yeas 49, nays 0
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
- Authored by Senators Becker and Leising
+ − Vote
February 1, 2022: Roll Call 187
- Yeas: 49