+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public Law 29
- Signed by the Governor
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 325: yeas 48, nays 1
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senators Bohacek and Taylor G added as coauthors
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 185: yeas 93, nays 2
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Merritt added as third author
- House sponsor: Representative Young J
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 14: yeas 49, nays 0
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Young M added as second author
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
- Authored by Senator Freeman