+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Law 252
On May 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 602: yeas 98, nays 0
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 526: yeas 50, nays 0
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Richardson, C. Brown and Hale
- House conferees appointed: Smaltz and Battles
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Pete Miller, Lanane and Landske
- Senate conferee appointed: Holdman and Tallian
- Senate dissented from House amendments
- Concurrence withdrawn
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur in House amendments filed
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Representative C. Brown added as cosponsor
- House Rule 105.1 suspended
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 262: yeas 97, nays 0
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
- Representative Davis added as cosponsor
- House Rule 105.1 suspended
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Representatives Richardson and Battles added as cosponsors
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 96: yeas 48 and nays 0
- Referred to the House
- House sponsor: Rep. Smaltz
- Cosponsor: Rep. Hale
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Senator Steele added as coauthor
- Senator Tallian added as third author
- Amendment 1 (Pete Miller), prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Elections
- Authored by Senators Pete Miller and Holdman
+ − Amendments (5)
Senate Amendment 0388-1
Passed
House Amendment 0388-1
Filed
House Amendment 0388-2
Filed
Senate Amendment 0388-C
Filed
Senate Amendment 0388-D
Passed
+ − Votes (6)
April 25, 2013: Roll Call No. 526
April 25, 2013: Roll Call No. 602
March 12, 2013: Roll Call No. 262
March 7, 2013: Roll Call No. 7907
February 11, 2013: Roll Call No. 96
February 4, 2013: Roll Call No. 7688
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor