+ − Summary
+ − Actions (28)
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Law 80
- Signed by the Governor
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 324: yeas 48, nays 0
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Representatives Manning and Jeter C added as cosponsors
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 317: yeas 93, nays 0
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Zay added as second author
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 115: yeas 39, nays 6
- House sponsor: Representative Soliday
- Senator Perfect added as coauthor
- Senator Niezgodski added as third author
- Senator Doriot added as coauthor
- Senator Baldwin added as coauthor
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment #3 (Breaux) failed; voice vote
- Amendment #2 (Breaux) failed; voice vote
- Amendment #1 (Koch) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities
- Authored by Senator Koch