+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Law 71
- Signed by the Governor
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate without amendments
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Wright added as cosponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 252: yeas 93, nays 0
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Cosponsor: Representative Lindauer
- House sponsor: Representative McNamara
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 147: yeas 47, nays 0
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Breaux added as third author
- Senator Bohacek added as second author
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
- Authored by Senator Messmer