+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 341: yeas 44, nays 0
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 252: yeas 64, nays 33
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment #2 (Riecken) failed; voice vote
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Representative DeVon added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 119: yeas 50, nays 0
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Broden added as third author
- Senator Charbonneau added as second author
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
- Authored by Senator Mishler
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor