+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Law 169
- Signed by the Governor
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 387: yeas 47, nays 0
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 386: yeas 97, nays 0
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Bartels and Hamilton
- House advisors appointed: Lindauer, Lehman, Kersey and Klinker
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Koch, Stoops and Spartz
- Senate conferees appointed: Messmer and Randolph Lonnie M
- Senate dissented from House amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Lawson added as cosponsor
- Rule 105.1 suspended
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 289: yeas 87, nays 7
- Representatives Klinker and Hamilton added as cosponsors
- Representative Lindauer added as cosponsor
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment #1 (Bartels) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- House sponsor: Representative Bartels
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 111: yeas 49, nays 0
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Senator Stoops added as coauthor
- Senator Koch added as second author
- Amendment #1 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
- Authored by Senator Messmer
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor