+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- House sponsor: Representative Clere
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 184: yeas 47, nays 1
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Koch added as second author
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
- Authored by Senator Eckerty
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor