+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 136
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 349: yeas 91, nays 2
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 341: yeas 41, nays 9
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate dissented from House amendments
- Senate conferees appointed: Busch and Breaux
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Lehman, Hostettler and Moed
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Ford Jon and Pol
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Carbaugh and GiaQuinta
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
- Concurrence withdrawn
- Motion to dissent filed
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 287: yeas 92, nays 1
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #1 (Bartels) prevailed; voice vote
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Representative Lehman added as cosponsor
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
- Representative GiaQuinta added as cosponsor
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Rogers added as coauthor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 184: yeas 39, nays 10
- House sponsor: Representative Carbaugh
- Senator Melton added as coauthor
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senators Becker and Breaux added as coauthors
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
- Senator Ford Jon added as second author
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Busch
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
February 1, 2022: Roll Call 184
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 10
February 1, 2022: Roll Call 287
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor