+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Law 66
- Signed by the Governor
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 326: yeas 46, nays 0
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Concurrence withdrawn
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 194: yeas 92, nays 0
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Representative Porter added as cosponsor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On January 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Cosponsor: Representative Heaton
- House sponsor: Representative Brown T
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 94: yeas 46, nays 0
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 (Bassler) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Ford Jon added as second author
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Authored by Senator Bassler
+ − Adopted Amendments (8)
+ − Proposed Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (2)
January 27, 2022: Roll Call 94
- Yeas: 46
January 27, 2022: Roll Call 194
- Yeas: 92