+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Law 154
- Signed by the Governor
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 552: yeas 47, nays 0
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 576: yeas 66, nays 1
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Prescott and Pfaff
- House advisors appointed: Eberhart, Karickhoff, Fleming and Hamilton
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Doriot, Lanane and Garten
- Senate conferees appointed: Raatz and Taylor G
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate dissented from House amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 352: yeas 94, nays 0
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment #4 (Eberhart) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #6 (Pierce) failed; Roll Call 339: yeas 31, nays 63
- Amendment #7 (Hamilton) failed; Roll Call 338: yeas 42, nays 52
- Amendment #2 (Goodin) motion withdrawn
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Representative Heaton added as cosponsor
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 174: yeas 35, nays 14
- House sponsor: Representative Prescott
- Cosponsor: Representative Eberhart
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Garten added as third author
- Amendment #2 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #1 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Doriot added as second author
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
- Authored by Senator Raatz
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor