+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Law 16
- Signed by the Governor
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate without amendments
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 203: yeas 95, nays 0
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Shackleford added as cosponsor
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Cosponsor: Representative Bacon
- House sponsor: Representative Kirchhofer
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 64: yeas 49, nays 0
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Mrvan added as coauthor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Becker added as second author
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
- Authored by Senator Charbonneau