+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Law 225
- Signed by the Governor
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 524: yeas 46, nays 0
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 438: yeas 95, nays 0
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Representatives Bacon, Shackleford, Beck added as cosponsors
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- House sponsor: Representative Kirchhofer
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 230: yeas 49, nays 0
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 (Crider) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senators Merritt, Ruckelshaus, Leising added as coauthors
- Senator Becker added as third author
- Senator Charbonneau added as second author
- Senator Becker removed as coauthor
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Becker added as coauthor
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
- Authored by Senator Crider