+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Law 170
- Signed by the Governor
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 451: yeas 48, nays 0
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 416: yeas 97, nays 0
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment #1 (Carbaugh) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Representative VanNatter removed as sponsor
- Representative Carbaugh added as sponsor
- Representative Carbaugh removed as cosponsor
- Representative VanNatter added as cosponsor
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Buck added as coauthor
- Cosponsors: Representatives Carbaugh, Lehman and Pressel
- House sponsor: Representative VanNatter
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 205: yeas 49, nays 0
- Senator Doriot added as second author
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Amendment #1 (Head) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
- Authored by Senator Head