+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Law 62
- Signed by the Governor
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 15, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Concur in House Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 402: yeas 28 and nays 20
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Withdraw Dissent: prevailed
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Smaltz added as advisor
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Forestal added as advisor
- Representative Beumer added as advisor
- Representative DeLaney added as conferee
- Representative Soliday added as conferee
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Withdraw Concurrence: prevailed
- Senate dissented from House amendments
- Senator Arnold added as conferee
- Senator Wyss added as conferee
- Senator Glick added as advisor
- Senator Lanane added as advisor
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 283: yeas 92 and nays 2
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading: engrossed.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading: Referred to Roads and Transportation
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Representative DeLaney added as cosponsor.
- Representative Soliday added sponsor.
- Referred to the House
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 117: yeas 48 and nays 0
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading: engrossed
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass amend, adopted.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to Civil Law
- Authored by Senator Wyss, Arnold J.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor