+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Law 51
- Signed by the Governor
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 339: yeas 44, nays 0
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 254: yeas 97, nays 0
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
- Representatives Porter and Brown, C. added as cosponsors
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Cosponsor: Representative Thompson
- House sponsor: Representative Beumer
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 62: yeas 49, nays 0
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Brown L added as second author
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health & Provider Services
- Authored by Senator Raatz
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor