+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- House sponsor: Representative Lyness
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 125: yeas 45, nays 2
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Rogers added as third author
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Bohacek added as coauthor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Doriot added as second author
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
- Authored by Senator Perfect