+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- House sponsor: Representative Behning
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 109: yeas 49, nays 1
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment #3 (Stoops) failed; voice vote
- Amendment #2 (Tallian) failed; voice vote
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Tallian added as coauthor
- Senator Buck added as third author
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse added as second author
On January 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
- Authored by Senator Merritt