+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Law 231
- Signed by the Governor
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 532: yeas 94, nays 0
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 495: yeas 43, nays 7
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Cook, Jordan, Candelaria Reardon and Smith V
- House conferees appointed: Behning and Porter
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Raatz and Melton
- Senate conferees appointed: Kruse and Taylor G
- Senate dissented from House amendments
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to dissent filed
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 414: yeas 97, nays 0
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Representative Clere added as cosponsor
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Cosponsors: Representatives Smith, V. and Porter
- House sponsor: Representative Behning
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 117: yeas 35, nays 15
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 (Taylor G) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Melton added as coauthor
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse added as second author
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
- Authored by Senator Taylor G