+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Law 101
- Signed by the Governor
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate without amendments
- Representatives Baird, Morrison, Arnold, Braun, Negele, Washburne, Borders, Ellington J, Koch, Davisson, McNamara, Riecken added as cosponsors
- Rule 105.1 suspended
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 211: yeas 94, nays 0
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Kersey added as cosponsor
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Representatives Heaton and Sullivan added as cosponsors
- First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Mrvan added as coauthor
- House sponsor: Representative Bacon
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 112: yeas 50, nays 0
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Ford added as coauthor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Tomes added as coauthor
- Senator Bassler added as coauthor
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
- Authored by Senators Becker and Messmer