+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Moseley added as advisor
- Representative Mahan added as advisor
- Representative Torr added as advisor
- Representative Macer added as conferee
- Representative Frye added as conferee
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator M. Young added as advisor
- Senator R. Young added as advisor
- Senator Wyss added as advisor
- Senator Stoops added as conferee
- Senator Waltz added as conferee
- Senate dissented from House amendments
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 264: yeas 95 and nays 3
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Koch added as cosponsor.
- Second reading: engrossed.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Arnold added as cosponsor.
- Representative Macer added as cosponsor.
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading: Referred to Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Representative Frye added as sponsor.
- Referred to the House
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 183: yeas 48 and nays 0
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading: engrossed
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted.
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Wyss added as second author.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, reassigned to Appropriations
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to Local Government
- Authored by Senator Waltz.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor