+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to dissent filed
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 340: yeas 57, nays 35
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
- Representative Soliday added as cosponsor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 164: yeas 49, nays 0
- Representative Brown, T. added as sponsor
- Referred to the House
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse added as coauthor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Miller, Pat added as third author
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Hershman added as second author
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Merritt added as coauthor
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senators Arnold and Ford added as coauthors
- Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation
- Authored by Senator Yoder