+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Olthoff added as cosponsor
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Senator Crane added as coauthor
- Cosponsors: Representatives Goodin and Siegrist
- House sponsor: Representative Karickhoff
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 62: yeas 45, nays 4
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Breaux added as coauthor
- Senator Bohacek added as second author
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
- Authored by Senator Grooms
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor