+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 132
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Raatz removed as advisor
- Senator Ford J.D. removed as conferee
- Senator Raatz added as conferee
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 366: yeas 35, nays 15
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 387: yeas 92, nays 4
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Behning and Smith V
- House advisors appointed: Goodrich, Cook and DeLaney
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to dissent filed
- Senate dissented from House amendments
- Senate conferees appointed: Buchanan and Ford J.D.
- Senate advisors appointed: Raatz and Melton
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 302: yeas 75, nays 22
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Representatives Goodrich and Teshka J added as cosponsors
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 175: yeas 37, nays 12
- House sponsor: Representative Behning
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Raatz added as second author
- Senator Crane added as third author
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #2 (Mishler) prevailed; voice vote
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
- Senator Kruse added as coauthor
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Buchanan
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
+ − Adopted Amendments (9)
+ − Proposed Amendments (21)
+ − Votes (2)
February 1, 2022: Roll Call 175
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 12
February 1, 2022: Roll Call 302
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 22